Please enter the code we just sent to **91-11-46710500** to proceed

Didn't Receive OTP?

Multiplication is one of the most vital math skills, but as the number increases, it becomes somewhat challenging for learners and other people. The good news is that there are lots of tips and techniques related to multiplication that would be helpful to you in solving math problems more efficiently and in a shorter amount of time. These tips not only increase the speed but also help the students to become better mental math calculators. Now let’s discuss 30 great multiplication tricks that can enrich each student and help him solve even the most complex maths problems!

One of the easiest multiplication secrets is to double one of the numbers and half the other. For instance, instead of solving 16 × 25 one might do changes to 8 × 50 which will be much easier.

When multiplying by 5, it is faster to multiply the number by 10 and then divide by 2. For instance, the multiplication 8 × 5 equals (8 × 10) ÷ 2 = 40.

It will be fun to use fingers with the number 9. For instance, when giving 9 × 7 let the fingers do the work, and hold up all the ten fingers. Lower the 7th finger and you are left with 6 fingers on the left hand only and 3 on the right hand only in total you have 63.

This one is easy: to add 10, 100, or 1000 to another number, we just add zeros as there are in these numbers to the other number. For instance, seven hundred equals seven times one hundred; which is 700.

Divide bigger numbers into smaller units. For example when finding the product of 14×12 then it is easier to work 10+4 = 14 then 10+2 = 12, such that 14 × 12 = (10 + 4) × (10 + 2) = 10 × 10 + 4 × 10 + 10 × 2 + 4 × 2.

To multiply a two-digit number with 11, the two digits have to be added together, and the resulting sum is then placed in the center which separates the two digits. Such as 11× 23 = 2 (2 + 3) 3 = 253.

When squaring numbers ending in 5, the first digit multiplied by itself plus one is placed before 25. For example, 25² is (2X 3) and then add 25 Therefore our answer is 625.

In other words, multiplying any number by 4 is just as simple as doubling the number and then doubling it once more. For instance, in the case of multiplication of 6 by 4 it will amount to doubling of 6, which makes it 12 then doubling of 12 to make it 24.

Take the number and multiply it by 10 and then add the number dividing it by an equal half. For example, 15 × 6 = (10 × 6) + (5 × 6), and which is equal to 60 + 30 = 90.

To multiply with 25, multiply with 100, and divide by four. For instance, 8 * 25 = 8 * 100 : 4 = 200.

Add 100 to the number and then divide the number by 2. For instance, if 16 people are given 50 units each, it equals 800 units; or if a test exam is given to 16 students with a total of 100 units, the distribution shall be 800/2.

Take the number and multiply it by 100 and then subtract that number which was obtained at the beginning from this new product. For example, the calculation of 14 multiplied by 99 will be equal to 14 multiplied by 100 minus 14, which is 1400 minus 14 equal to 1386.

Maths-wise, large numbers always give a lot of trouble, so in such cases, break them down into small manageable segments. For instance the expression 23 × 47 can be written as (20 + 3) × (40 + 7) derived from the fact that 23 = 20 + 3 and 47 = 40 + 7 hence the use of the distributive property.

When multiplying a number by a two-digit number that ends in one the first digit is multiplied by the number to be multiplied and the result is added to the original number. For example 31 × 6 = 30 × 6 + 6 = 186.

To multiply it by 19, the number needs to be multiplied by 20 and then the result must be subtracted by the original number. For instance, if you want to find out 19 times 5, you can convert that into 20 multiplied by 5 and then subtract 5 which equals 95.

The best option for the two-digit numbers is cross multiplication through which the required calculations will be subdivided into simpler steps. Finding an approximation of 23 × 34 is easily possible with this method Though this method works well for numbers like for 23 × 34.

To multiply by 8 you need to double the number three times. For instance consider 6 × 8, multiplying 6 by 6 is 12, then 12 by 6 which equals 24, and once more 24 by 6 will be 48.

For clarity, you should multiply the numbers that are easily multiplied. For instance, when solving 29 × 5, some people will opt to use 30 × 5 and then do 5 – 5.

If the last two digits of a number form an even number, multiply the number by 3 then divide the result by 2. For instance, 6 × 8 is the same as (3 × 8) which is equals to 24, and then 24 × 2 = 48.

The easiest way to multiply it by 3 is to use the doubling method where you double the figure and then add the original figure to the doubled one. For instance, let us solve the multiplication 9 x 3, it can also be expressed as 9 X 2 + 9, which is therefore equivalent to 18 + 9 = 27.

In case numbers such as 98, and 97 multiply and subtract the numbers from 100, then multiply the two differences and reduce from 10000.

When one has to multiply a number with seven, add five and then add a double of the number. For example 7 × 4 = 5 × 4 + 2 × 4 = 20 + 8 = 28.

When numbers are 9 and 8, use 10, 8 and subtract the second number from the product of the two numbers 10 to get 72.

The other way to double-check is by estimation because when multiplying large numbers, the results may sometimes seem incorrect.

The lattice method is a technique where large multiplication problems are divided into grids.

Take the square of 10, add the original number, and finally add one-third of the said digit. For instance, 13 multiplied by 4 is equal to 10 × 4 + 4 + 4/3 Lastly, the three examples of how to factorize are as follows:

When multiplying large numbers, divide these numbers into smaller numbers or what is referred to as ‘chunks’ which are easy to manage.

Learn to cross numbers and divide numbers so that they can be broken down into their respective factors and fractions. For instance, 24 × 9 can also be solved by the breaking down of 24 into 20 + 4, then using FOIL where we have:

Apply identities such as (a + b) (a – b) = a² – b² where possible in multiplication exercises.

There is no special trick in multiplication and the best multiplication trick is to practice. This is true for every musician, the more you play the instrument more improved and faster you are in playing or performing the song.

After learning these 30 multiplication tricks, you will be able to solve all the difficult math problems easily!

Alpha Math offers a game-based learning experience with a unique four-step approach to mastering every concept in math. | **Choose a pack and begin an amazing journey** Alpha Math

Phonics classes | Public Speaking Classes | Creative writing classes | Bhagavad gita classes

Discover a wonder-filled world of children's activities near you! Check our online classes.

Discover a wonder-filled world of children's activities near you! Check our online classes.